Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wells Fargo Bank Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Tenant 4, Tenant 3, Tenant 2, Tenant 1, State Of Florida- Agency For Workforce Innovation, (total of 9) See All represented by Perry, John R, in the jurisdiction of Flagler County. This case was filed in Flagler County Superior Courts with ZAMBRANO, RAUL presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 31, 2008 |
CategoryReal Prop/Mort Foreclosure (Pre2010) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationFlagler County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 16, 2009 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION SHEET | |
July 16, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY CASE DISMISSAL - OR BK 1744 PG 1930 | |
April 27, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL ARTHUR W UNKN SPOUSE OF ADAMS (DEFENDANT); ANY AND ALL UNKN PARTIES (DEFENDANT); TENANT 1 (DEFENDANT); TENANT 2 (DEFENDANT); TENANT 3 (DEFENDANT); TENANT 4 (DEFENDANT) | |
January 21, 2009 | Docket Event | PL'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT INCLUDING A HEARING TO TAX ATTORNEY'S FEES & COSTS | |
October 13, 2008 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-SERVED ON 08/13/2008 STATE OF FLORIDA- AGENCY FOR WORKFORCE INNOVATION (DEFENDANT); | |
September 26, 2008 | Docket Event | CIRC CIV ADDITIONAL DEFENDANT > 5 FEE RECEIPT: 59203 DATE: 09/26/2008 | |
September 24, 2008 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-NONSERVED TENANT 2 (DEFENDANT); | |
September 24, 2008 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-SERVED ON 09/20/2008 ARTHUR W ADAMS (DEFENDANT); | |
September 24, 2008 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-NONSERVED TENANT 1 (DEFENDANT); | |
September 24, 2008 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-SERVED ON 09/20/2008 JOYCE ADAMS (DEFENDANT); |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.