Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Peoples First Community Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Mallory, Sherri Denton, against Deland Inveriones Ca, Rendon, Coromoto Bustillos, Ordonez, Lusant, Vazquez, Roberto E, Bluesea International Group Inc, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Flagler County. This case was filed in Flagler County Superior Courts with ZAMBRANO, RAUL presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 31, 2008 |
CategoryReal Prop/Mort Foreclosure (Pre2010) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationFlagler County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 24, 2008 | Docket Event | AMENDED ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO VOLUSIA COUNTY | |
December 03, 2008 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE FROM - LUSANT ORDONEZ (DEFENDANT) | |
December 03, 2008 | Docket Event | DO NOT DOCKET -CASE TRANSFERRED TO VOL CO | |
November 20, 2008 | Docket Event | ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO VOLUSIA COUNTY | |
November 05, 2008 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT /DEFAULT - ROBERTO E VAZQUEZ (DEFENDANT) | |
November 05, 2008 | Docket Event | MOTION REQUESTING CASE BE TRANSFERRED TO VOLUSIA COUNTY | |
November 05, 2008 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT /DEFAULT - DELAND INVERIONES CA (DEFENDANT) | |
November 05, 2008 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT /DEFAULT - BLUESEA INTERNATIONAL GROUP INC (DEFENDANT) | |
November 05, 2008 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE -SERVED 10/25/08 - LUSANT ORDONEZ (DEFENDANT) | |
October 16, 2008 | Docket Event | NONMILITARY AFFIDAVIT - ROBERTO E VAZQUEZ (DEFENDANT) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.