Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Adams, Joan, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Goan, Timothy M, against Christian, Claudette, Allstate Property And Casualty Ins Co, represented by Villa, Suzanne F, in the jurisdiction of Flagler County. This case was filed in Flagler County Superior Courts with ZAMBRANO, RAUL presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 31, 2008 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationFlagler County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 04, 2010 | Docket Event | CLOSED CASE/ Pages: 1 | |
February 03, 2010 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL W/PREJ | |
February 03, 2010 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL W/PREJ | |
December 16, 2009 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S EXPERT WITNESS LIST | |
November 25, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY | |
November 13, 2009 | Docket Event | MEDIATION DISPOSITION REPORT | |
November 13, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT/OFFER OF JUDGMENT ETC | |
November 10, 2009 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE | |
October 23, 2009 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR COPIES OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY - PALM COAST PODIATRY | |
October 23, 2009 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF MEDIATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.