Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Suntrust Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Potopsingh, Marie, against Conservatory Property Owners Association Inc, Unkn Tenant #1, Unkn Sps Of Sean Zeer, Zeer, Sean, Unkn Sps Of Harr Zeer, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Flagler County. This case was filed in Flagler County Superior Courts with ZAMBRANO, RAUL presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 31, 2008 |
CategoryReal Prop/Mort Foreclosure (Pre2010) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationFlagler County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 23, 2010 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE OR BK 1765 PG 1278 | |
April 23, 2010 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT/ Pages: 1 | |
April 06, 2010 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION/ Pages: 1 | |
April 06, 2010 | Docket Event | CIRC CIV SERVICE CHARGE FOR JUDICIAL SALE RECEIPT: 107433 DATE: 04/06/2010/ Pages: 1 | |
April 06, 2010 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE TO PL - $100.00/ Pages: 1 | |
January 08, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SALE - 4/6/2010 PUBLISH 2X 1/23/10, 1/30/10/ Pages: 2 | |
January 08, 2010 | Docket Event | CIRC CIV REOPEN FILING FEE RECEIPT: 100151 DATE: 01/08/2010/ Pages: 1 | |
January 06, 2010 | Docket Event | ORDER RESCHEDULING FORECLOSURE SALE - 4/6/10 @ 11:00AM | |
January 06, 2010 | Docket Event | MOTION RESCHEDULING FORECLOSURE SALE/ Pages: 1 | |
November 16, 2009 | Docket Event | FAX COPY - SALE CANCELLED FOR 11/17/2009/ Pages: 1 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.