Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Aurora Loan Services Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Hoffman, L. Joseph, against Mortgage Electronic Reg Sys Inc, John Doe, Doe, Mary, Saldivar, Sally W, Saldivar, Andres Jr, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Flagler County. This case was filed in Flagler County Superior Courts with ZAMBRANO, RAUL presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 31, 2008 |
CategoryReal Prop/Mort Foreclosure (Pre2010) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationFlagler County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 18, 2010 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT BARRING DEFENDANT FROM CLAIMING ANY INTEREST ON THE PROPERTY - OR BK 1792 PG 1829 | |
October 08, 2010 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING-10/15/10 | |
May 18, 2010 | Docket Event | COURT EVENT EVENT: HEARING DATE: 10/15/2010 TIME: 1:30 PM JUDGE: ZAMBRANO, JUDGE RAUL LOCATION: HEARING ROOM 4A | |
May 07, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING-10/15/10 | |
December 23, 2009 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT/DEFAULT SUNTRUST BANK | |
December 17, 2009 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT INCLUDING A HEARING TO TAX ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS | |
October 23, 2009 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-SERVED 10/09/09 SUNTRUST BANK | |
September 30, 2009 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED SUNTRUST BANK | |
September 30, 2009 | Docket Event | CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEES (SUMMONS) RECEIPT: 92462 DATE: 09/30/2009 | |
September 29, 2009 | Docket Event | SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT TP REFORECLOSE MORTGAGE TO FORECLOSE OMMITTED DEFENDANT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.