Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lanzer, Lynn, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Lanzer, Michael L, in the jurisdiction of Flagler County. This case was filed in Flagler County Superior Courts with ZAMBRANO, RAUL presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 28, 2005 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFlagler County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 30, 2006 | Docket Event | ADDRESS CHANGE- - LYNN A LANZER | |
January 05, 2006 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL WRIT RETURNED BY JUDGE ORDER | |
January 03, 2006 | Docket Event | ORD-RPT OF THE GM IS APPROVED & CONFIRMED, PET MOTION, ETC. | |
December 29, 2005 | Docket Event | C/C WRIT OF BODILY ATTACHMENT | |
December 29, 2005 | Docket Event | FILE TO CHILD SUPPORT/RETURNED 12/30/05 | |
December 28, 2005 | Docket Event | FILE TO MIKE COOK - RTND 12/29/05 | |
December 15, 2005 | Docket Event | FILE TO CHILD SUPPORT - RTND 12/16/05 | |
December 13, 2005 | Docket Event | REPORT & RECOMMENDATIONS OF THE GM | |
December 09, 2005 | Docket Event | QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER | |
December 09, 2005 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE FROM LYNN SAVAGE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.