Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Long, Thomothin, Long, Jimmy Lee, Long, Debbie Sue, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Rotstein, Jonathan Isaac, against Payne, Irene Maria, represented by Partridge, Philip L, in the jurisdiction of Flagler County. This case was filed in Flagler County Superior Courts with ZAMBRANO, RAUL presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 28, 2005 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationFlagler County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 12, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE | |
July 05, 2005 | Docket Event | MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY | |
June 27, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT ETC-T | |
June 27, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT,ETC-D | |
June 27, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT,ETC-J | |
May 13, 2005 | Docket Event | DEF'S RESPONSE TO PL'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS | |
May 04, 2005 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS | |
May 04, 2005 | Docket Event | DENIAL OF AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES | |
May 04, 2005 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS | |
May 04, 2005 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.