Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Sigmund, Rosemary O'Reilly, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Sigmund, Edmund H, in the jurisdiction of Flagler County. This case was filed in Flagler County Superior Courts with ZAMBRANO, RAUL presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeZAMBRANO, RAUL Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 20, 2005 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFlagler County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 24, 2006 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE - NO SUPPORT - Recorded (OR.2442.665. / 2020018211) | |
January 23, 2006 | Docket Event | FILE TO JUDGE-RAZ - RTND 1/24/06 | |
January 20, 2006 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF FLORIDA RESIDENCY | |
January 20, 2006 | Docket Event | ANSWER AND WAIVER - EDMUND H. SIGMUND | |
January 20, 2006 | Docket Event | AFF OF SERV-SERVED EDMUND H. SIGMUND, 12/28/05 | |
January 20, 2006 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS | |
January 03, 2006 | Docket Event | STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER | |
December 30, 2005 | Docket Event | FILE TO MIKE COOK - RTND 1/3/06 | |
December 20, 2005 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED -EDMUND H. SIGMUND | |
December 20, 2005 | Docket Event | REC# 5005782 $363.00 FEE CD: ADOM FROM: ANN W. ROGERS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.