Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
Wall, Camren Christine, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Fretwell, Joseph Shawn, in the jurisdiction of Escambia County. This case was filed in Escambia County Superior Courts Circuit with MILLER, JOHN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 20, 2024 |
CategoryDomestic Violence |
Last RefreshedJune 04, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEscambia County, FL |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 31, 2024 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE TEMPORARY INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION SERVED 05/21/2024 | |
May 31, 2024 | Docket Event | SWORN STATEMENT OF POSSESSION OF FIREARMS | |
May 29, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF PETITION FOR TEMPORARY INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE | |
May 29, 2024 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
May 20, 2024 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 05/20/2024 CASE NUMBER 2024 DR 001775 | |
May 20, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RELATED CASES | |
May 20, 2024 | Docket Event | EMAIL DESIGNATION. | |
May 20, 2024 | Docket Event | FAMILY COVER SHEET | |
May 20, 2024 | Docket Event | DOMESTIC VIOLENCE INFORMATION SHEET | |
May 20, 2024 | Docket Event | DOMESTIC VIOLENCE HEARING SET FOR 05/29/2024 AT 8:00 AM IN CR 101/ , JDG: MILLER, JOHN L |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.