Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Linn, Cynthia M filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Escambia County. This case was filed in Escambia County Superior Courts Circuit with Kinsey, Jennie presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKinsey, Jennie Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 27, 2021 |
CategoryEstate $1,000 Or More |
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationEscambia County, FL |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 09, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL (RECORDED) - Recorded (OR.8941.1875 / 2023018658) | |
March 08, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
March 08, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL (RECORDED) | |
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event | MAIL RETURNED BY POST OFFICE AS UNDELIVERABLE | |
February 10, 2023 | Docket Event | HEARING SET FOR 03/08/2023 AT 1:30 PM IN ZOOM/ , JDG: BOLES, W.. JOEL | |
February 09, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER ON MOTION TO DISMISS - 3/8/2023 @ 1:30 PM | |
January 04, 2023 | Docket Event | MAIL RETURNED BY POST OFFICE AS UNDELIVERABLE | |
December 28, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL | |
October 19, 2022 | Docket Event | CLERK'S MEMO- SENT EMAIL TO PROBATE CASE MANAGER ON STATUS - EMAIL PROBATE CASE MANAGER | |
July 06, 2022 | Docket Event | CLERK'S MEMO- FORWARD ORDER TO NEW PROBATE CASE MANAGER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.