Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Mcmanus Roofing, Inc., filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Minshew, Lisa S, against Northwest Florida Comprehensive Services For Children, Synovus Bank And Its Division Coastal Bank And Trust, represented by Barnett, Ryan M, Bates, Philip Alan, Caldwell, Charles M Ii, in the jurisdiction of Escambia County. This case was filed in Escambia County Superior Courts Circuit with Robinson, Coleman presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 23, 2021 |
CategoryContract & Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationEscambia County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
This complaint was filed by McManus Roofing, Inc. against Northwest Florida Comprehensive Services for Children, Inc. (NWFCSC) and Synovus Bank, and its division Coastal Bank and Trust. McManus Roofing alleges that they entered into a contract with N...
NOTICE OF FINAL SERVICE
Date: September 08, 2021SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED
Date: September 08, 2021NOTICE OF LISPENDENS - Recorded (OR.8604.679 / 2021094285)
Date: August 25, 2021DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY AND SECONDARY EMAIL ADDRESSES
Date: August 23, 2021ORDER REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING
Date: August 24, 2021NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVITS OF SERVICE
Date: September 08, 2021COMPLAINT
Date: August 23, 2021NOTICE OF LISPENDENS
Date: August 23, 2021CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: August 23, 2021NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Date: April 27, 2023AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: April 06, 2023NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING
Date: April 27, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: November 07, 2022AFFIDAVIT IN RESPECT TO ATTORNEY’S FEES AND COSTS
Date: August 16, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: December 13, 2022NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT IN RESPECT TO ATTORNEY’S FEES AND COSTS
Date: August 16, 2022MOTION FOR DIRECTED VERDICT
Date: July 27, 2022ORDER SETTING JURY TRIAL PE-TRIAL CONFERENCE AND DISCOVERY SCHEDULE
Date: February 08, 2022VERDICT
Date: July 28, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 27, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
April 27, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING | |
April 27, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING | |
December 13, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
November 28, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING EVIDENCE ADMITTED AT EVIDENTIARY HEARING HELD NOVEMBER 28, 2022 OF ATTORNEY’S FEES AND COSTS SPREADSHEET AS EXHIBIT “2" WHICH IS CLEARER COPY OF WHAT WAS ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT “1" AFFIDAVIT | |
November 28, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY’S FEES AND COSTS WHICH WAS ADMITTED INTO EVIDENCE AT EVIDENTIARY HEARING ON NOVEMBER 28, 2022 AS EXHIBIT “1" | |
November 28, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT/COUNTER-PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING VERIFIED ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF/COUNTER-DEFENDANT'S INTERROGATORIES & RESPONSIVE DOCUMENTS TO PLAINTIFF/COUNTER-DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION | |
November 25, 2022 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING | |
November 25, 2022 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF, MCMANUS ROOFING, INC.’S, MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY AND MOTION FOR SANCTIONS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.