Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Boyd, Lora, Boyd, Todd, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Green, Dennis D Jr, against Heritage Property And Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Prince, Jessica J, in the jurisdiction of Escambia County. This case was filed in Escambia County Superior Courts with DANNHEISSER, THOMAS . presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 30, 2021 |
CategoryContract & Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationEscambia County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
This complaint is filed by Todd Boyd and Lora Boyd against Heritage Property and Casualty Insurance Company. The plaintiffs are seeking damages for breach of contract under a policy of insurance. The damages being claimed exceed $30,000. The plaintif...
DEFENDANT’S ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS’ REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION
Date: September 21, 2021COMPLAINT
Date: March 30, 2021NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE
Date: December 23, 2021DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DETERMINATION OF UNIFIED PLAINTIFF
Date: August 19, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 23, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
December 23, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT’S ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS’ REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION | |
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DETERMINATION OF UNIFIED PLAINTIFF | |
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT | |
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME | |
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event | EMAIL DESIGNATION. | |
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL | |
March 31, 2021 | Docket Event | DENNIS@LAWOFFICEOFDENNISGREEN.COM, PENCRTPLEADINGS@WICKERSMITH | |
March 31, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY: GREEN, DENNIS D JR ASSIGNED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.