Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
ABELL, HILDA vs. UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
On March 30, 2021 a contract & indebtedness case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Escambia County. Judge Bergosh, Gary presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
March 30, 2021
Last Refreshed
October 06, 2023
Filing Location
Escambia County, FL
Filing Court House
Circuit
Category
CONTRACT & INDEBTEDNESS
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
General Creditor
Status
Dismissal
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE
Date: Jan 13, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: Mar 30, 2021Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
January 31, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY WITHIN FIRM AND EMAIL DESIGNATION | |
January 13, 2022 | Docket Event | INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER-GENERAL | |
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES | |
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FIRM NAME CHANGE AND EMAIL DESIGNATION | |
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT, UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY’S, NOTICE OF SERVING VERIFIED ANSWERS AND OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF’S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES | |
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT, UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY’S, NOTICE OF SERVING VERIFIED ANSWERS AND OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF’S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES | |
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT’S PRIVILEGE LOG IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF’S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO DEFENDANT | |
July 16, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT, UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY’S, NOTICE OF SERVING UNVERIFIED ANSWERS AND OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF’S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES | |
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event | AGREED ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES | |
June 25, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT, UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY’S, RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF’S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS | |
June 25, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT, UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY’S, ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL TO PLAINTIFF’S COMPLAINT | |
June 25, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF’S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES | |
June 25, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT, UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY’S, RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF, HILDA ABELL, FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS | |
June 07, 2021 | Docket Event | AGREED ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AND DISCOVERY REQUEST | |
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF’S COMPLAINT AND DISCOVERY REQUESTS | |
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL | |
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event | EMAIL DESIGNATION. | |
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS | |
March 31, 2021 | Docket Event | Bergosh, Gary L: ASSIGNED | |
March 31, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 03/31/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 CA 000752 | |
March 31, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY: GARCIA, DAVID F ASSIGNED | |
March 31, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED | |
March 31, 2021 | Docket Event | YIA17@YOURINSURANCEATTORNEY.COM, ESERVICE@YOURINSURANCEATTORNEY.COM, JBOSCH@QPWBLAW.COM, DANIEL.GLEN@QPWBLAW.COM, MSHABKA.PLEADINGS@QPWBLAW.COM, TIMOTHY.SWEENEY@QPWBLAW.COM, NATHAN.VILLAVERDE@QPWBLAW | |
March 31, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY: DIAZ, ARISTIDES ASSIGNED | |
March 31, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2021023852 | |
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event | PROPOSED SUMMONS | |
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS | |
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY'S REQUEST FOR DEPOSITION DATES | |
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES | |
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS |