Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Dcm Services C O Verizon Wireless, Schrader, Patricia M, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Escambia County. This case was filed in Escambia County Superior Courts Circuit with Boles, W. Joel presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 02, 2021 |
CategoryProbate - Formal |
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationEscambia County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 10, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISCHARGE - Recorded (OR.8974.1794 / 2023037046) | |
May 05, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISCHARGE | |
May 05, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
April 07, 2023 | Docket Event | CHECKLIST FOR CLOSING FORMAL ADMIN | |
April 07, 2023 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF INV | |
March 01, 2023 | Docket Event | WAIVER AND CONSENT TO DISCHARGE - MADISON BRANNEN | |
March 01, 2023 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR DISCHARGE | |
February 25, 2023 | Docket Event | FLORIDA NON TAX CERTIFICATE/AFFIDAVIT OF NO FL ESTATE TAX | |
February 25, 2023 | Docket Event | STATEMENT REGARDING CREDITORS | |
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER REQUIRING - CLOSING OF ESTATE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.