Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Cascade, Escambia County Ems, Florida Agency For Health Care Administration, Phillips & Cohen Associates Ltd On Behalf Of Cox Communications, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Escambia County. This case was filed in Escambia County Superior Courts Circuit with [ U ] BOLES, W. JOEL presiding.
Case Number |
Judge[ U ] BOLES, W. JOEL Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 16, 2021 |
CategoryEstates < $1,000 |
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationEscambia County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2022 | Docket Event | CLOSED CASE CLAIM LETTER | |
June 27, 2022 | Docket Event | CLAIM ENTERED - CASCADE FOR $1,400.00 | |
January 20, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER DETERMINING HOMESTEAD PROPERTY - Recorded (OR.8705.1581 / 2022006281) | |
January 20, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION - Recorded (OR.8705.1586 / 2022006283) | |
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER DETERMINING HOMESTEAD PROPERTY | |
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION | |
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE - AHCA | |
November 23, 2021 | Docket Event | COPY OF CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPTS | |
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event | CLAIM ENTERED - FLORIDA AGENCY FOR HEALTH CARE ADMIN FOR $39,777.52 (MAILED TO PETITIONER) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.