Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Cook, filed a(n) Foreign Subpoena case against Wyndham Vacation Rentals North America Llc, in the jurisdiction of Escambia County. This case was filed in Escambia County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 22, 2021 |
CategoryForeign Subpoena |
Last RefreshedApril 01, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationEscambia County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 04/13/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 CA 000872 | |
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $11.00 RECEIPT #2021027269 | |
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF EVIDENCE, STATE OF GEORGIA, FORSYTH COUNTY ISSUED (COTTON REAL ESTATE INC C/O ITS REGISTERED AGENT, BASS & SANDFORT ACCOUNTATNTS PA) | |
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF EVIDENCE, STATE OF GEORGIA, FORSYTH COUNTY ISSUED (WILLIAM BOESCH) | |
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE OF THE ATTWOOD FIRM LLC -- REGARDING ISSUANCE OF SUBPOENA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.