Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Boyle, Bevan E, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Hanson, Josh Michael, in the jurisdiction of Escambia County. This case was filed in Escambia County Superior Courts Circuit with MILLER, JOHN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMILLER, JOHN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 06, 2020 |
CategoryDomestic Violence |
Last RefreshedNovember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEscambia County, FL |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT DISPOSED/DESTROYED - PER RECORDS DISPOSITION NO. 760 | |
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT NOTICE SENT | |
April 07, 2020 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT LIST | |
March 23, 2020 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE WITH MINOR CHILDREN - Recorded (OR.8267.230 / 2020024570) | |
March 18, 2020 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE WITH MINOR CHILDREN | |
March 18, 2020 | Docket Event | SWORN STATEMENT OF POSSESSION OF FIREARMS | |
March 18, 2020 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
March 13, 2020 | Docket Event | JAMESBE@FAVORHOUSE | |
March 13, 2020 | Docket Event | PETITIONER'S ATTORNEY: ETHERIDGE, JAMES BERNARD ASSIGNED | |
March 12, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.