Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Becnel, Thomas R, Tropics Group Llp A Florida Limited Liability Partnership, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Bauman, Steven B, against Becnel, Damon R, New Venture Of Destin Llc A Florida Limited Liability Company, represented by Rafool, Raymond, in the jurisdiction of Escambia County. This case was filed in Escambia County Superior Courts Circuit with Bergosh, Gary presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2020 |
CategoryOther Real Prop $50,001-$249,999 |
Last RefreshedOctober 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationEscambia County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
DEFENDANTS’ ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS’ FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: December 01, 2021FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: October 19, 2021ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION
Date: July 21, 2023PLAINTIFFS' FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO DEFENDANTS
Date: August 25, 2021PLAINTIFFS' FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSION TO DEFENDANTS
Date: August 24, 2021LISPENDENS - Recorded (OR.8435.1102 / 2020116137)
Date: December 31, 2020NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION, MOTION TO DISMISS AND NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: April 14, 2023PROPOSED SUMMONS
Date: December 30, 2020SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: December 31, 2020DEFENDANTS’ RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS’ FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANTS
Date: September 23, 2021EMAIL DESIGNATION.
Date: December 30, 2020PAYMENT $930.00 RECEIPT #2020085918
Date: December 31, 2020COMPLAINT
Date: December 30, 2020CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: December 30, 2020LISPENDENS
Date: December 30, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 21, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION | |
July 21, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
April 14, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION, MOTION TO DISMISS AND NOTICE OF HEARING | |
April 26, 2022 | Docket Event | INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - GENERAL | |
February 15, 2022 | Docket Event | STIPULATED AGREEMENT | |
December 01, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS’ ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS’ FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT | |
November 04, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S ATTORNEY: RAFOOL, RAYMOND ASSIGNED | |
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS | |
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event | FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT | |
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event | THE PARTIES JOINT STIPULATION TO PLAINTIFF'S FILING THEIR FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.