Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Park, Emily, filed a(n) Other Circuit Civil Post 2010 case represented by Cardoso, Ryan M, against Adventures Abound At Pensacola Beach Llc, Taylor, Carl, represented by Mcdonald, Michael Andrew, Miller, Douglas Grayson, in the jurisdiction of Escambia County. This case was filed in Escambia County Superior Courts with WILLIAMS, THOMAS H presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWILLIAMS, THOMAS H Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 16, 2020 |
CategoryOther Circuit Civil Post 2010 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 12, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationEscambia County, FL |
|
This complaint was filed by Emily Park on behalf of her minor child, N.P., against defendants Carl Taylor and Adventures Abound @ Pensacola Beach, LLC d/b/a Laguna's. The complaint alleges negligence, battery, negligent security, and vicarious liabil...
COMPLAINT
Date: December 16, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 10, 2022 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT | |
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT ADVENTURES ABOUND @ PENSACOLA BEACH, LLC’S SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSES AND OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF’S SECOND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS | |
February 21, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS ADVENTURE ABOUND @ PENSACOLA BEACH, LLC AND CARL TAYLOR’S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS’ AMENDED COMPLAINT | |
February 11, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTIGN DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTS IV V AND VI OF PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT | |
February 03, 2022 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS’ MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF’S AMENDED COMPLAINT | |
January 20, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF HEARING | |
January 13, 2022 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY | |
January 12, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY | |
January 12, 2022 | Docket Event | INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - GENERAL | |
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT ADVENTURES ABOUND @ PENSACOLA BEACH, LLC’S RESPONSES AND OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF’S SECOND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.