Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Hamilton, Charles Kevin filed a(n) General Appeals - Appeals case in the jurisdiction of Escambia County. This case was filed in Escambia County Superior Courts Circuit with Clark, Lacey Powell presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeClark, Lacey Powell Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 28, 2019 |
CategoryAppeal From County Court |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaAppeals |
Filing LocationEscambia County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Appeals |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 09, 2020 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
November 09, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL | |
October 01, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER DIRECTING APPELLANT TO SHOW CAUSE | |
September 17, 2019 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO NOTICE OF INQUIRY | |
September 13, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF INQUIRY | |
August 30, 2019 | Docket Event | RECORD ON APPEAL PREPARED | |
July 22, 2019 | Docket Event | CORRECTED AP NOTIFICATION LETTER | |
June 28, 2019 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 06/28/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019 AP 000016 | |
June 28, 2019 | Docket Event | AP NOTIFICATION LETTER | |
June 28, 2019 | Docket Event | CLARK, LACEY POWELL: ASSIGNED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.