Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mcmillian, Drucilla, filed a(n) Custody,Visitation - Family case against Mccastle, Jermaine A, Autrey, Elizabeth Victoria, in the jurisdiction of Escambia County. This case was filed in Escambia County Superior Courts with MCIVER (YP), KEITH A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMCIVER (YP), KEITH A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 01, 2018 |
CategoryCustody |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEscambia County, FL |
Matter TypeCustody,Visitation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 19, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION - Recorded (OR.8316.1759 / 2020049685) | |
June 17, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION | |
June 17, 2020 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
May 18, 2020 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING 6/17/2020 AT 10:30 AM | |
April 16, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION | |
January 29, 2020 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE FROM STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS | |
January 17, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION | |
October 01, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RELATED CASES | |
October 01, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS FILED WITH CLERK DETERMINING THAT APPLICANT IS INDIGENT | |
October 01, 2018 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 10/01/2018 CASE NUMBER 2018 DR 004011 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.