Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Rease, Chauncey Monee, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Williams, Kashunda Tanale, in the jurisdiction of Escambia County. This case was filed in Escambia County Superior Courts Circuit with Allen, Michael presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 08, 2017 |
CategoryStalking (Per F.S. 784.0485) |
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationEscambia County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 27, 2022 | Docket Event | REOPENED CASE CLOSED | |
July 14, 2022 | Docket Event | ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 2022-19 ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSING OF INACTIVE REOPENED CIVIL CASES | |
April 23, 2019 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FROM NON-PARTY RETURNED SERVED ON 4/15/19 | |
April 23, 2019 | Docket Event | RETURN RESTRAINING ORDER SETTING HEARING ON MOTION FOR MODIFICATION OF INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST STALKING NON-EXECUTED | |
April 17, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER ON MOTION TO MODIFY THE FINAL JUDGMENT OF INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST STALKING | |
April 12, 2019 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FROM NONPARTY | |
April 12, 2019 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $4.00 RECEIPT #2019033953 | |
April 11, 2019 | Docket Event | EMERGENCY CORRESPONDENCE FROM PETITIONER | |
April 01, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NONPARTY | |
February 18, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING HEARING ON MOTION FOR MODIFICATION OF INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST STALKING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.