Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Southerland Iii, Leonard Bradshaw, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Southerland, Melissa Ann, in the jurisdiction of Escambia County. This case was filed in Escambia County Superior Courts with SHACKELFORD, JAN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2015 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEscambia County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 16, 2016 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT AND MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT - SIGNED ON 03/15/2016 - Recorded (OR.7492.1499 / 2016019043) | |
March 15, 2016 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
March 15, 2016 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT AND MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT - SIGNED ON 03/15/2016 | |
March 15, 2016 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY/PRO SE COVER LETTER | |
March 15, 2016 | Docket Event | CHECK LIST FOR NO HEARING | |
January 25, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT FOR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
January 25, 2016 | Docket Event | SPECIAL AFFIDAVIT FOR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
January 04, 2016 | Docket Event | ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE MELISSA SOUTHERLAND ON 12/31/2015 | |
January 04, 2016 | Docket Event | SHACKELFORD, JAN: ASSIGNED | |
January 04, 2016 | Docket Event | ANSWER WAIVER OF FINAL JUDGMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.