Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hopson, Dr. Joyce Marie, filed a(n) Custody,Visitation - Family case against In Re: Temporary Legal Custody, in the jurisdiction of Escambia County. This case was filed in Escambia County Superior Courts with ALLEN, MICHAEL presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 05, 2015 |
CategoryCustody |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEscambia County, FL |
Matter TypeCustody,Visitation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 17, 2015 | Docket Event | DEATH CERTIFICATE | |
August 17, 2015 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
August 17, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER ON MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES 2015 DR 1786 INTO 2006 DP 359; 44406 | |
August 17, 2015 | Docket Event | TABLE OF CONSANGUINITY | |
August 17, 2015 | Docket Event | COPY OF EMAIL | |
July 22, 2015 | Docket Event | PETITIONER'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES | |
May 08, 2015 | Docket Event | JUDGE ALLEN, MICHAEL: ASSIGNED | |
May 07, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO DIV 'H' | |
May 05, 2015 | Docket Event | FAMILY COURT COVER SHEET | |
May 05, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RELATED CASES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.