Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Pennymac Loan Services Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Slowik, Matthew M, against Malone, Michael A, Unknown Spouse Of Michael A Malone, Unknown Tenant 1 In Possession Of The Property, Unknown Tenant 2 In Possession Of The Property, represented by Kelly, Christine A, Kelly Fausel, Christine A, in the jurisdiction of Escambia County. This case was filed in Escambia County Superior Courts Circuit with Clark, Lacey Powell presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2015 |
CategoryHomestead Foreclosure $50,001-$249,999 |
Last RefreshedDecember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationEscambia County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
ORIGINAL NOTE
Date: November 29, 2016MOTION TO VACATE FINAL JUDGMENT OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE AND DISMISS ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Date: January 15, 2019NOTICE OF FILING
Date: November 29, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 08, 2020 | Docket Event | COPY OF ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR COURT TO TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE AND TO TRANSFER ORIGINAL DOCUMENT | |
July 08, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO VACATE FINAL JUDGMENT OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE AND DISMISS ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE - Recorded (OR.8124.665 / 2019058594) | |
July 02, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO VACATE FINAL JUDGMENT OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE AND DISMISS ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |
June 06, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
March 07, 2019 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S ATTORNEY: KELLY FAUSEL, CHRISTINE A ASSIGNED | |
March 04, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER APPROVING JOINT STIPULATED MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL | |
February 28, 2019 | Docket Event | JOINT STIPULATED MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL | |
February 04, 2019 | Docket Event | CLARK, LACEY POWELL: ASSIGNED | |
January 16, 2019 | Docket Event | FIRST COLLECTIONS NOTICE SENT | |
January 15, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION TO VACATE FINAL JUDGMENT OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE AND DISMISS ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.