Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bank Of America Na, Bayview Loan Servicing Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Unknown Tenant In Possession 2, Unknown Tenant In Possession 1, Chandelle Subdivision Homeowners Association Inc, Bank Of America Na, Offenburger, Melissa, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Escambia County. This case was filed in Escambia County Superior Courts with MCIVER, KEITH A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMCIVER, KEITH A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategoryHomestead Foreclosure $50,001-$249,999 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationEscambia County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 07, 2019 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE FILED | |
May 05, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER RELEASING ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS DISMISSING ACTION AND RELEASING THE LIS PENDENS - Recorded (OR.7707.890 / 2017033475) | |
April 28, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER RELEASING ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS DISMISSING ACTION AND RELEASING THE LIS PENDENS | |
April 28, 2017 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
March 02, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME | |
March 02, 2017 | Docket Event | MOTION TO RELEASE ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENT, DISMISS ACTION, AND RELEASE THE LIS PENDENS | |
December 29, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
November 08, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
October 25, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS CO-COUNSEL FOR PLANTIFF | |
August 10, 2016 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF ORDER ON MOTION TO CANCEL MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENTS OF FORECLOSURE HEARING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.