Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Murray, Agnes H, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Brightwell, William A Iv, against Occupant, in the jurisdiction of Escambia County. This case was filed in Escambia County Superior Courts with ALLEN, MICHAEL presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2014 |
CategoryEjectment $50,000 Or Less |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationEscambia County, FL |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 19, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER FROM DISTRICT COURT DISMISSING APPEAL DCA# 1D16-4368 | |
November 10, 2016 | Docket Event | RECORD ON APPEAL PREPARED AND TRANSMITTED TO DISTRICT COURT, DCA# 1D16-4368 | |
October 11, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER FROM DISTRICT COURT REF: FILING FEE DCA# 1D16-4368 | |
September 28, 2016 | Docket Event | DISTRICT COURT RECEIPT LETTER FILED, DCA #1D16-4368 | |
September 27, 2016 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $100.00 RECEIPT #2016096693 | |
September 26, 2016 | Docket Event | FIRST COLLECTIONS NOTICE SENT | |
September 26, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEAL - Recorded (OR.7596.501 / 2016074234) | |
September 22, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEAL | |
August 23, 2016 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBIT BB - RECEIPT | |
August 23, 2016 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT, PLAINTIFF |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.