Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Martin, Johnathon T, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Watkins, Sarah A, in the jurisdiction of Escambia County. This case was filed in Escambia County Superior Courts with BOLES, W JOEL presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2009 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEscambia County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 19, 2010 | Docket Event | COPIES & CERTIFICATIONS RECEIPT: 1209409 DATE: 10/19/2010 | |
June 21, 2010 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL - RETURN TO SENDER | |
June 09, 2010 | Docket Event | DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE REPORT FAMILY DISSOLUTION/ANULMENT OF MARRIAGE SENT ON: 06/09/2010 14:57:46 | |
June 07, 2010 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT (6/4/10) | |
June 07, 2010 | Docket Event | CIVIL COUNT/PARTY DISPOSED BY JUDGE | |
May 12, 2010 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL - RETURN TO SENDER | |
May 04, 2010 | Docket Event | SPECIAL AFFIDAVIT FOR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
May 04, 2010 | Docket Event | POSTAL CHARGES RECEIPT: 1147350 DATE: 05/04/2010 | |
May 04, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT FOR UNCONTESTED DOM | |
May 04, 2010 | Docket Event | OATH/ATTEST/ADMINISTER RECEIPT: 1147350 DATE: 05/04/2010 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.