Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bryars, Crystal J, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Shepard, Matthew, in the jurisdiction of Escambia County. This case was filed in Escambia County Superior Courts with JONES, MICHAEL presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 12, 2009 |
CategoryRepeat Violence |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationEscambia County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 07, 2010 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL - RETURN TO SENDER | |
March 12, 2010 | Docket Event | RETURN ORDER SETTING HEARING NOT SERVED 3/11/10 | |
March 10, 2010 | Docket Event | ORDER ON REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF INJUNCTION - DENIED | |
March 03, 2010 | Docket Event | COURT EVENT SET - CIVIL EVENT: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE HEARING DATE: 03/10/2010 TIME: 8:00 AM JUDGE: JONES, MICHAEL LOCATION: M.C. BLANCHARD JUDICIAL BUILDING | |
February 26, 2010 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING HEARING | |
February 11, 2010 | Docket Event | OBJECTION TO MOTION TO DISMISS INJUNCTION - CRYSTAL BRYARS | |
February 02, 2010 | Docket Event | OATH/ATTEST/ADMINISTER RECEIPT: 1111278 DATE: 02/02/2010 | |
February 02, 2010 | Docket Event | POSTAL CHARGES RECEIPT: 1111278 DATE: 02/02/2010 | |
February 02, 2010 | Docket Event | MOTION TO DISMISS INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DATING VIOLENCE | |
December 01, 2009 | Docket Event | CIVIL COUNT/PARTY DISPOSED BY JUDGE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.