Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Garcia, Carlita S, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Garcia, Daniel A, in the jurisdiction of Escambia County. This case was filed in Escambia County Superior Courts with BOLES, W JOEL presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 02, 2009 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEscambia County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 06, 2011 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL - RETURN TO SENDER | |
November 23, 2011 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
November 23, 2011 | Docket Event | CIVIL COUNTS/PARTY DISPOSED AFTER HEARING | |
July 25, 2011 | Docket Event | MOTION TO SET FINAL HEARING FOR DISSOLSUTION OF MARRIAGE - RESPONDENT | |
July 19, 2011 | Docket Event | ORDER FINDING GOOD CAUSE SHOWN AND CONDITIONALLY CONTINUING ACTION | |
July 08, 2011 | Docket Event | FAMILY MEDIATION REPORT | |
July 08, 2011 | Docket Event | MEDIATED MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
July 07, 2011 | Docket Event | MEDIATION FEE FAMILY INCOME < $50K/YEAR - WIFE RECEIPT 1304905 REVERSED BY 1304908 ON 07/07/2011. RECEIPT: 1304909 DATE: 07/07/2011 | |
July 07, 2011 | Docket Event | MEDIATION FEE FAMILY INCOME < $50K/YEAR - HUSBAND RECEIPT 1304905 REVERSED BY 1304908 ON 07/07/2011. RECEIPT: 1304910 DATE: 07/07/2011 | |
June 27, 2011 | Docket Event | MOTION, NOTICE & JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.