Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Gray, Terrance Jr, Ghboun, Anna Lee, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Bush, Rebecca, Bush, Angela M, in the jurisdiction of Escambia County. This case was filed in Escambia County Superior Courts with NOBLES, LINDA L.. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 03, 2009 |
CategoryRepeat Violence |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationEscambia County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 17, 2009 | Docket Event | CIVIL COUNTS/PARTY DISPOSED AFTER HEARING | |
September 16, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER DISMISSING TEMPORARY INJUNCTION | |
September 10, 2009 | Docket Event | RETURN RESTRAINING ORDER SERVED 9/4/09 | |
September 03, 2009 | Docket Event | PETITION FILED | |
September 03, 2009 | Docket Event | TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER | |
September 03, 2009 | Docket Event | COURT EVENT SET - CIVIL EVENT: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE HEARING DATE: 09/16/2009 TIME: 8:00 AM JUDGE: RASMUSSEN, PAUL A LOCATION: M.C. BLANCHARD JUDICIAL BUILDING | |
September 03, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RELATED CASES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.