Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Campbell, Donna Lynne, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Campbell, William Russell, in the jurisdiction of Escambia County. This case was filed in Escambia County Superior Courts with BOLES, W JOEL presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 02, 2009 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEscambia County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 19, 2009 | Docket Event | DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE REPORT FAMILY DISSOLUTION/ANULMENT OF MARRIAGE SENT ON: 11/19/2009 11:28:29 | |
November 19, 2009 | Docket Event | CIVIL COUNT/PARTY DISPOSED BY JUDGE | |
November 13, 2009 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY/PRO SE COVER LETTER | |
November 13, 2009 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT (SIGNED 11/13/09) & AGREEMENT | |
September 22, 2009 | Docket Event | SPECIAL AFFIDAVIT FOR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
September 22, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING SPECIAL AFFIDAVIT FOR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
September 22, 2009 | Docket Event | CHECK LIST FOR NO HEARING | |
September 02, 2009 | Docket Event | AGREEMENT TO WAIVE FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE | |
September 02, 2009 | Docket Event | AGREEMENT | |
September 02, 2009 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.