Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Burkhart, Dorothy S filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Escambia County. This case was filed in Escambia County Superior Courts with NICKINSON, E P III presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2009 |
CategoryEstate $1,000 Or More |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationEscambia County, FL |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 08, 2010 | Docket Event | ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION | |
January 08, 2010 | Docket Event | JUDICIAL RESPONSE | |
January 08, 2010 | Docket Event | ORDER DETERMINING HOMESTEAD PROPERTY | |
January 06, 2010 | Docket Event | CLERK'S CHECK SHEET | |
January 04, 2010 | Docket Event | DEATH CERTIFICATE ON DOROTHY S BURKHART | |
December 31, 2009 | Docket Event | SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION $1,000 OR MORE RECEIPT: 1099874 DATE: 12/31/2009 | |
December 31, 2009 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION | |
December 31, 2009 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE TO CLERK FROM ATTY DEMARIA | |
December 31, 2009 | Docket Event | PETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.