Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Guttmann, Stephen M filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Escambia County. This case was filed in Escambia County Superior Courts with KINSEY, JENNIE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 02, 2009 |
CategoryProbate - Formal |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationEscambia County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 25, 2011 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISCHARGE | |
March 14, 2011 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF ACCTG SERV OF P/D RECEIPT OF BENEF AND CONSENT | |
March 14, 2011 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR DISCHARGE | |
January 06, 2011 | Docket Event | ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO CLOSE ESTATE UNTIL 3/31/2011 | |
January 03, 2011 | Docket Event | PETITION TO EXTEND TIME TO CLOSE ESTATE | |
December 21, 2010 | Docket Event | ORDER REQUIRING - CLOSING OF ESTATE | |
March 30, 2010 | Docket Event | STATEMENT REGARDING CREDITORS | |
January 12, 2010 | Docket Event | INVENTORY | |
December 22, 2009 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION SUN PRESS 12/10/2009 & 12/17/2009 | |
December 08, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER PRESCRIBING TIME REQUIREMENTS CP (PROBATE) ORDER PRESCRIBING TIME REQUIREMENTS SENT ON: 12/08/2009 11:11:01 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.