Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Marvin, Lillie Samuel filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Escambia County. This case was filed in Escambia County Superior Courts with NICKINSON, E P III presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 11, 2003 |
CategoryEstate $1,000 Or More |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationEscambia County, FL |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 05, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION | |
November 05, 2009 | Docket Event | JUDICIAL RESPONSE | |
November 05, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER ADMITTING WILL | |
November 04, 2009 | Docket Event | DEATH CERTIFICATE | |
November 03, 2009 | Docket Event | CLERK'S CHECK SHEET | |
November 02, 2009 | Docket Event | CONSENT AND WAIVER OF NOTICE | |
November 02, 2009 | Docket Event | SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION $1,000 OR MORE RECEIPT: 1080556 DATE: 11/02/2009 | |
November 02, 2009 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE TO CLERK FROM ATTORNEY | |
November 02, 2009 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION | |
November 02, 2009 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED COPIES RECEIPT: 1080556 DATE: 11/02/2009 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.