Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Dcm Svcs For Chase, Wells Fargo Financialc O Dcm Services Llc, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Escambia County. This case was filed in Escambia County Superior Courts with JONES, MICHAEL presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 02, 2009 |
CategoryEstates < $1,000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationEscambia County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 13, 2010 | Docket Event | COPY OF CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK/CLOSED LTR | |
October 12, 2010 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE TO CLERK FROM DCM SVCS | |
October 12, 2010 | Docket Event | CLAIM FILED 10/13/2010 AMOUNT: 21,110.51 FOR: DCM SVCS FOR CHASE | |
May 18, 2010 | Docket Event | COPY OF STATEMENT OF CLAIM LETTER/CLOSED ESTATE | |
May 17, 2010 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE TO CLK FROM CLAIMANT | |
May 17, 2010 | Docket Event | CLAIM ADDED ON: 05/17/2010 AMT:$510.14 FOR: WELLS FARGO FINANCIALC/O DCM SERVICES LLC | |
November 05, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION | |
November 05, 2009 | Docket Event | JUDICIAL RESPONSE | |
November 05, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER ADMITTING WILL | |
November 05, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER DETERMINING HOMESTEAD PROPERTY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.