Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Kirksey, Mary Alice filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Escambia County. This case was filed in Escambia County Superior Courts with JONES, MICHAEL presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 05, 2009 |
CategoryEstate $1,000 Or More |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationEscambia County, FL |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 11, 2009 | Docket Event | JUDICIAL RESPONSE/ORDER SIGNED | |
August 11, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION | |
August 07, 2009 | Docket Event | CLERK'S CHECK SHEET | |
August 06, 2009 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE TO CLERK FROM ATTORNEY | |
August 05, 2009 | Docket Event | DEATH CERTIFICATE | |
August 05, 2009 | Docket Event | SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION $1,000 OR MORE RECEIPT: 1047422 DATE: 08/05/2009 | |
August 05, 2009 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.