Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Manheim Automotive Financial Services Inc A, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Stepter, Charles R Jr, against Daniel, Jimmy B, Automotive Alternative Resource Center Inc, in the jurisdiction of Escambia County. This case was filed in Escambia County Superior Courts with GOODMAN, ROSS presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 12, 2009 |
CategoryContract & Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationEscambia County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 02, 2011 | Docket Event | ORDER TO COMPEL COMPLETION OF POST-JUDGMENT DISCOVERY IN AID OF EXECUTION RETURNED SERVED | |
January 24, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING | |
January 24, 2011 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
December 15, 2010 | Docket Event | COPIES/CERTIFICATIONS RECEIPT: 1229563 DATE: 12/15/2010 | |
December 10, 2010 | Docket Event | ORDER TO COMPEL COMPLETION OF POST-JUDGMENT DISCOVERY IN AID OF EXECUTION | |
December 10, 2010 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COPIES | |
December 10, 2010 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE OF ATTY | |
December 10, 2010 | Docket Event | MANHEIM AUTOMOTIVE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.'S AMENDED MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEFENDANTS COMPLETION OF POST-JUDGMENT DISCOVERY IN AID OF EXECUTION | |
October 13, 2010 | Docket Event | ORDER RETURNED SERVED | |
September 22, 2010 | Docket Event | COPIES/CERTIFICATIONS (CERT COPY OF ORDER TO COMPEL TO SHERIFF FOR SERVICE) RECEIPT: 1199730 DATE: 09/22/2010 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.