Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Crema Coffee And Baking Company Llc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Kreke, Donald M, against Allstate Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Escambia County. This case was filed in Escambia County Superior Courts with TERRELL, TERRY D presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 02, 2009 |
CategoryContract & Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationEscambia County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 16, 2010 | Docket Event | VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
August 16, 2010 | Docket Event | DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING OTHER | |
May 24, 2010 | Docket Event | COPIES/CERTIFICATIONS RECEIPT: 1156793 DATE: 05/28/2010 | |
May 24, 2010 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COPIES | |
April 26, 2010 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME | |
April 26, 2010 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE OF ATTY | |
April 26, 2010 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME | |
February 01, 2010 | Docket Event | COPIES/CERTIFICATIONS RECEIPT: 1111514 DATE: 02/02/2010 | |
February 01, 2010 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COPIES | |
December 10, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.