Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bank Of America Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Santos, Grace S, against Unknown Tenant #2, Unknown Tenant #1, United Guaranty Residential Insurance Company Of, Unknown Spouse Of Nikelle L Collins, Collins, Nikelle L, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Escambia County. This case was filed in Escambia County Superior Courts with PARNHAM, JOHN T presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 05, 2009 |
CategoryHomestead Foreclosure $50,001-$249,999 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationEscambia County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 30, 2013 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $34.30 RECEIPT #2013049599 | |
July 30, 2013 | Docket Event | DOC STAMPS ASSESSED $34.30 | |
July 24, 2013 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE OF ATTY | |
June 26, 2013 | Docket Event | MAIL RETURNED | |
June 21, 2013 | Docket Event | MAIL RETURNED | |
June 12, 2013 | Docket Event | DOC STAMPS ASSESSED $448.70 | |
June 12, 2013 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $448.70 RECEIPT #2013035002 | |
June 12, 2013 | Docket Event | RECEIPT # 2013028879 MODIFIED: PAYMENT $0.00 | |
May 23, 2013 | Docket Event | SUSPENSE - CASE ASSESSED $448.70 | |
May 23, 2013 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $448.70 RECEIPT #2013028879 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.