Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Williams, Jacqueline, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Stone, S Scott, against Forster And Howell Inc A Foreign Profit, represented by Cozart, Stephen M, in the jurisdiction of Escambia County. This case was filed in Escambia County Superior Courts with KINSEY, JENNIE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryNegligence |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationEscambia County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 24, 2010 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
March 24, 2010 | Docket Event | DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING PURSUANT TO MEDIATED SETTLEMENT | |
March 22, 2010 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL | |
January 15, 2010 | Docket Event | REPORT OF MEDIATION AS SETTLED | |
November 30, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MEDIATION | |
July 28, 2009 | Docket Event | RESPONSE | |
July 20, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION | |
July 14, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS | |
June 08, 2009 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION | |
June 08, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.