Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Harvesters Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Sorenson, James E, against Bank Of America, Nellums, Noah, represented by Pro, Se, in the jurisdiction of Escambia County. This case was filed in Escambia County Superior Courts with BERGOSH, GARY L presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryMortgage Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationEscambia County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 05, 2009 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE TO PURCHASER CRCIVIL LETTER - CERT TITLE W/BARCD SENT ON: 08/05/2009 09:56:14 | |
June 30, 2009 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE | |
June 04, 2009 | Docket Event | SALE OF MORTGAGE/FORECLOSURE RECEIPT: 1022960 DATE: 06/04/2009 | |
June 04, 2009 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE, PLAINTIFF $100.00 | |
June 04, 2009 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE SALE WORKSHEET | |
May 28, 2009 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION | |
May 19, 2009 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OR BOOK:6460 OR PAGE:1581 | |
May 14, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SALE SUN PRESS EVENT: MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SALE - CIRCUIT CIVIL DATE: 06/04/2009 TIME: 11:00 AM JUDGE: DEPUTY CLERK - CIRCUIT CIVIL LOCATION: | |
May 14, 2009 | Docket Event | CIVIL COUNT/PARTY DISPOSED BY JUDGE | |
May 12, 2009 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT, PLAINTIFF $82,725.08 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.