Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Midland Credit Management Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Grigoryan, Meline, against Konvalin, Sheri L, represented by In Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of Amador County. This case was filed in Amador County Superior Courts with SEXTON, ANDREA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 16, 2021 |
CategoryContract: Collections (09) |
Last RefreshedNovember 03, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationAmador County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
HEARING SET: Event: FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Date: 02/23/2022 Time: 1:30 pm Judge: SEXTON, ANDREA Location: DEPT 3
Judge: SEXTON, ANDREA |
|
March 15, 2021 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF REASONABLE DILIGENCE. MELINE GRIGORYAN (Attorney) on behalf of MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC (PLAINTIFF) | |
March 15, 2021 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF MAILING MELINE GRIGORYAN (Attorney) on behalf of MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC (PLAINTIFF) | |
March 15, 2021 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS TO SHERI KONVALIN OF SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT, NOTICE OF INCLUSION IN DELAY REDUCTION PROGRAM AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR) PACKET ON 03/03/2021. MELINE GRIGORYAN (Attorney) on behalf of MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC (PLAINTIFF) | |
February 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
HEARING SET: Event: FIRST CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Date: 09/01/2021 Time: 1:30 pm Judge: SEXTON, ANDREA Location: DEPT 3
Judge: SEXTON, ANDREA |
|
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED & FILED | |
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF INCLUSION IN DELAY REDUCTION | |
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event | CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET | |
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT DEMAND UNDER $10K Receipt: 261452 Date: 02/18/2021 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.