Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Linda Whitfield, filed a(n) case represented by Thompson, David Candido, against Liam Patrick Mcguinnes, State Farm Mutual Insurance Company, represented by Edens, Thomas P Ii, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil with FELTEL JR, GILBERT presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 23, 2023 |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 22, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
|
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil |
This complaint is filed by Linda Whitfield against Liam Patrick McGuinnes and State Farm Mutual Insurance Company. The complaint alleges negligence on the part of McGuinnes, who collided with Whitfield's vehicle, causing her serious and permanent inj...
NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (PLAINTIFF'S) TO DEFT, LIAM PATRICK MCGUINNESS
Date: August 09, 2023RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S) TO DEFT, LIAM PATRICK MCGUINNES
Date: August 09, 2023REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTF'S FIRST) TO DEFT STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INS CO
Date: July 19, 2023REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTF'S FIRST) TO DEFT LIAM PATRICK MCGUINNES
Date: July 19, 2023NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING INTERROGATORIES (PLTF'S) TO DEFT LIAM PATRICK MCGUINNES
Date: July 19, 2023RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLTF'S) /DEFT LIAM PATRICK MFGUINESS'S
Date: July 18, 2023NOTICE OF NON-SERVICE OF PROCESS
Date: July 19, 2023ORDER GRANTING PLTFS UNOPPOSED MOTION TO CORRECT SRIVENER'S ERROR
Date: July 18, 2023CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4446988
Date: July 17, 2023ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED TO STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY
Date: July 18, 2023REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFENDANT, LIAM PATRICK MCGUINNES) TOP LAINTIFF
Date: June 19, 2023MOTION (PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED) TO CORRECT SCRIVENER'S ERROR
Date: July 13, 2023NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF-DEFENDANT'S
Date: June 19, 2023REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (DEFENDANT, LIAM PATRICK MCGUINNES' TO PLAINTIFF
Date: June 19, 2023PRIVILEGE LOG (DEFENDNAT, LIAM PATRICK MCGUINNES')
Date: June 19, 2023NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DEFTS MOTION TO DISMISS
Date: June 14, 2023ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES -DEFT
Date: June 13, 2023MOTION TO DISMISS (DEFT LIAM PATRICK MCGUINNES)
Date: June 13, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL THOMAS EDENS II FOR LIAM MCGUINNES
Date: June 13, 2023AMENDED ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR NON-COMPLEX CASES
Date: May 15, 2023ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR NON-COMPLEX CASES
Date: March 31, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED FOR STATE FARM MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Date: March 23, 2023CASE FEES PAID: $421.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4372600
Date: March 31, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED FOR LIAM PATRICK MCGUINNES
Date: March 23, 2023COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL
Date: March 23, 2023COVER SHEET
Date: March 23, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (PLAINTIFF'S) TO DEFT, LIAM PATRICK MCGUINNESS | |
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S) TO DEFT, LIAM PATRICK MCGUINNES | |
July 21, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS ELECTRONIC DELIVERY ON 07/21/2023 TO LYNETTE COLEMAN FOR STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTO INS CO | |
July 19, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTF'S FIRST) TO DEFT STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INS CO | |
July 19, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING INTERROGATORIES (PLTF'S) TO DEFT STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INS CO | |
July 19, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTF'S FIRST) TO DEFT LIAM PATRICK MCGUINNES | |
July 19, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING INTERROGATORIES (PLTF'S) TO DEFT LIAM PATRICK MCGUINNES | |
July 19, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF NON-SERVICE OF PROCESS | |
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLTF'S) /DEFT LIAM PATRICK MFGUINESS'S | |
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING PLTFS UNOPPOSED MOTION TO CORRECT SRIVENER'S ERROR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.