Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Rica Hughes, filed a(n) case represented by Cooley, Savannah Leigh, Lari, Younes, against Walgreen Co., represented by Kiesow, Sarah Marie, Stokes, Joseph Bailey Iii, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil with WALLACE, III, WADDELL A. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 23, 2023 |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
|
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil |
This complaint is a legal document filed by the plaintiff, Rica Hughes, against the defendant, Walgreen Co. The plaintiff alleges that on February 27, 2023, she slipped and fell on a liquid inside the Walgreens store located at 5 3rd Street, Jacksonv...
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF COUNSEL YOUNES LARI FOR RICA HUGHES
Date: July 28, 2023REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFT'S)
Date: August 01, 2023NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES - DEFT
Date: August 01, 2023ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (DEFT WALGREEN CO'S) TO PLTFS COMPLAINT
Date: June 15, 2023CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4371759
Date: March 31, 2023AMENDED ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR NON-COMPLEX CASES
Date: May 15, 2023ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR NON-COMPLEX CASES
Date: March 31, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED FOR WALGREEN CO.
Date: March 23, 2023COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL
Date: March 23, 2023COVER SHEET
Date: March 23, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFT'S) | |
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES - DEFT | |
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF COUNSEL YOUNES LARI FOR RICA HUGHES | |
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event | ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (DEFT WALGREEN CO'S) TO PLTFS COMPLAINT | |
June 02, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 05/26/2023 01:00PM SERVED CORPORATE PARTNERSHIP, WALGREEN CO, | |
June 01, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL SARAH KIESOW FOR WALGREEN CO. (DEFTS) ADDITIONAL OF RECORD AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES FOR SERVICE OF DOCUMENTS | |
June 01, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL JOSEPH STOKES III FOR WALGREEN CO. AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES FOR SERVICE OF DOCUMENTS | |
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event | AMENDED ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR NON-COMPLEX CASES | |
March 31, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4371759 | |
March 31, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR NON-COMPLEX CASES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.