Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Mccloud, On Behalf Of Her Minor Child, Randy Shaw Iii, Paulicia Jenkins Mccloud, Paulicia Mccloud, On Behalf Of Her Minor Child, Corina Spann, Randy Jenkins Shaw, On Behalf Of Minor Child, Randy Shaw, Iii Jr, filed a(n) case represented by Reeves, Reganel J Sr, against Erin Mcfall, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil with SHARRIT, MICHAEL presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 23, 2023 |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
|
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil |
This complaint is filed by Paulicia McCloud, on behalf of her minor child Corina Spann, and Paulicia McCloud and Randy Shaw Jr., on behalf of her minor child Randy Shaw III, against the defendant Erin McFall. The complaint alleges general negligence ...
CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4371675
Date: March 23, 2023AMENDED ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR NON-COMPLEX CASES
Date: May 15, 2023MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (PLTF'S) TO EFFECT SERVICE OF PROCESS
Date: July 11, 2023AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: April 19, 2023ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR NON-COMPLEX CASES
Date: March 31, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: March 23, 2023COVER SHEET
Date: March 23, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED TO ERIN MCFALL
Date: March 23, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 14, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING MOTION (PLTFS.) FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO EFFECT SERVICE OF PROCESS | |
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (PLTF'S) TO EFFECT SERVICE OF PROCESS | |
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event | AMENDED ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR NON-COMPLEX CASES | |
April 19, 2023 | Docket Event | AMENDED COMPLAINT | |
March 31, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR NON-COMPLEX CASES | |
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4371675 | |
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event | COVER SHEET | |
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED TO ERIN MCFALL | |
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL REGANEL REEVES SR. FOR PAULICIA MCCLOUD AND RANDY SHAW JR (AMENDED) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.