Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Dionne Orr, filed a(n) case represented by Coleman, Donald Ray Jr, against Declan Hammerling, Trae Matthew Staker, represented by Russell, Megan Saige Block, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil with DEES, ROBERT M presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 23, 2023 |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
|
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Dionne Orr against Trae Matthew Staker and Declan Hammerling. The complaint seeks damages in excess of $50,000, exclusive of attorneys' fees, interest, and costs. The plaintiff demands a trial by jury. The ...
ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (DEFTS')
Date: August 02, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL MEGAN RUSSELL FOR TRAE STAKER AND DECLAN HAMMERLING
Date: August 02, 2023REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (PLTF'S)
Date: August 03, 2023SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED ON TRAE MATTHEW STAKER ON 06/13/2023
Date: June 14, 2023DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS - DEFTS
Date: August 02, 2023AMENDED ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR NON-COMPLEX CASES
Date: May 15, 2023NOTICE OF SERVING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER
Date: April 11, 2023NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING INTERROGATORIES (PLAINTIFF'S) TO DEFENDANT TRAE MATTHEW STAKER
Date: April 11, 2023CASE FEES PAID: $421.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4371414
Date: March 30, 2023REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFFS') TO DEFENDANT TRAE MATTHEW STAKER
Date: April 11, 2023NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING INTERROGATORIES (PLAINTIFFS) TO DEFENDANT DECLAN HAMMERLING
Date: April 11, 2023ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR NON-COMPLEX CASES
Date: April 05, 2023REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S) TO DEFENDANT DECLAN HAMMERLING
Date: April 11, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED TO DECLAN HAMMERLING
Date: March 23, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED TO TRAE MATTHEW STAKER
Date: March 23, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: March 23, 2023COVER SHEET
Date: March 23, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 03, 2023 | Docket Event | REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (PLTF'S) | |
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event | ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (DEFTS') | |
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL MEGAN RUSSELL FOR TRAE STAKER AND DECLAN HAMMERLING | |
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS - DEFTS | |
July 07, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION (PLTFS) TO EXTEND TIME TO EFFECTUATE SERVICE OF PROCESS ON DEFT TRAE MATTHEW STAKER | |
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED ON TRAE MATTHEW STAKER ON 06/13/2023 | |
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event | AMENDED ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR NON-COMPLEX CASES | |
May 11, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 05/10/2023 08:30AM SUBSTITUTE, KIM STAKER FOR DECLAN HAMMERLING | |
April 11, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER | |
April 11, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING INTERROGATORIES (PLAINTIFF'S) TO DEFENDANT TRAE MATTHEW STAKER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.