Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
John T. Skipper, filed a(n) case represented by Miller, Joseph Scott, against Esh Hospitality, Inc., A Florida Profit Corporation, represented by Flores, Annmarie G, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil with NORTON, VIRGINIA B. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 23, 2023 |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 22, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
|
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil |
This complaint is filed by John T. Skipper against ESH Hospitality, Inc., a Florida Profit Corporation. The complaint alleges negligence on the part of ESH Hospitality, Inc. in maintaining a property located at 10020 Skinner Lake Dr., Jacksonville, D...
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (DEFTS) FIRST SET/ TO PLTF
Date: August 18, 2023REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFTS FIRST) TO PLTF
Date: August 18, 2023CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4406058
Date: May 16, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED FOR ESH HOSPITALITY, INC C/O NATIONAL REGISTERED AGENTS, INC
Date: May 16, 2023AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL
Date: May 16, 2023AMENDED ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR NON-COMPLEX CASES
Date: May 15, 2023CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4370481
Date: March 30, 2023ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR NON-COMPLEX CASES
Date: March 30, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED FOR ESH HOSPITALITY, INC
Date: March 23, 2023COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL
Date: March 23, 2023COVER SHEET
Date: March 23, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 18, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (DEFTS) FIRST SET/ TO PLTF | |
August 18, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFTS FIRST) TO PLTF | |
July 25, 2023 | Docket Event | ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (DEFENDNAT'S) TO PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT | |
July 25, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL ANNMARIE FLORES FOR ESH HOSPITALITY, INC., A FLORIDA PROFIT CORPORATION AND ESH HOSPITALITY, INC., A DELEWARE CORPORATION AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES | |
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 06/27/2023 10:22AM REGISTERED AGENT, ESH HOSPITALITY, INC | |
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4406058 | |
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED FOR ESH HOSPITALITY, INC C/O NATIONAL REGISTERED AGENTS, INC | |
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event | AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL | |
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event | AMENDED ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR NON-COMPLEX CASES | |
May 04, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 05/01/2023 11:00AM CORPORATE SERVICE, ESH HOSPITALITY, INC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.