Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Frances Marie Moore, filed a(n) case represented by Frisbie, Joshua Harrison, against Lakewood South And Trust, Winn-Dixie Stores, Inc., represented by Topkin, Sanford Roy, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil with NORTON, VIRGINIA B. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 23, 2023 |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
|
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Frances Marie Moore against Lakewood South and Trust and Jane Doe in the Circuit Court of the 4th Judicial Circuit in Duval County, Florida. The complaint alleges negligence on the part of the defendants, r...
STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Date: August 11, 2023REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (DEFT WINN-DIXIE)
Date: June 23, 2023REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFT WINN-DIXIE)
Date: June 23, 2023MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME DEF, WINN-DIXIE MOTION FOR EXTENSIN OF TIME
Date: June 06, 2023NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (DEFT WINN-DIXIE)
Date: June 23, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL SANFORD TOPKIN FOR WINN-DIXIE STORES, INC.
Date: June 23, 2023DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS (DEFT WINN-DIXIE)
Date: June 23, 2023CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4409755
Date: May 22, 2023MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME DEF, WINN-DIXIE MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: June 06, 2023REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTF) TO DEFT WINN-DIXIE STORES, INC.
Date: May 22, 2023NOTICE OF CHANGE OF COUNSEL JOSHUA FRISBIE FOR FRANCES MARIE MOORE
Date: May 22, 2023NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT WINN-DIXIE STORES, INC. - PLTF
Date: May 22, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED TO WINN-DIXIE STORES, INC.
Date: May 22, 2023AMENDED ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR NON-COMPLEX CASES
Date: May 15, 2023AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: May 22, 2023ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR NON-COMPLEX CASES
Date: March 29, 2023CASE FEES PAID: $401.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4370262
Date: March 29, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: March 23, 2023COVER SHEET
Date: March 23, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL | |
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (DEFT WINN-DIXIE) | |
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFT WINN-DIXIE) | |
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (DEFT WINN-DIXIE) | |
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL SANFORD TOPKIN FOR WINN-DIXIE STORES, INC. | |
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS (DEFT WINN-DIXIE) | |
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME DEF, WINN-DIXIE MOTION FOR EXTENSIN OF TIME | |
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME DEF, WINN-DIXIE MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME | |
May 26, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 05/26/2023 08:56AM CORPORATE SERVICE, WINN-DIXIE STORES, INC | |
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4409755 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.