Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Erich G Gallardo, filed a(n) case represented by Slater, Thomas Fitzpatrick, against Daniel Roger Downing, Usaa General Indemnity Company, represented by Wright, Virgil William Iii, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil with AHO, MARIANNE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 23, 2023 |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
|
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Erich G. Gallardo against USAA General Indemnity Company and Daniel Roger Downing. The complaint alleges that on July 15, 2022, Daniel negligently crashed into the rear of a vehicle operated by Mark D. Durd...
CASE FEES PAID: $401.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4369578
Date: March 29, 2023CASE FEES PAID: $20.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4440179
Date: July 10, 2023AMENDED ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR NON-COMPLEX CASES
Date: May 15, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED DANIEL ROGER DOWNING
Date: July 06, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED FOR USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY
Date: July 06, 2023ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR NON-COMPLEX CASES
Date: March 29, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: March 23, 2023COVER SHEET
Date: March 23, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL VIRGIL WRIGHT III FOR DANIEL DOWNING AND DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL | |
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $20.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4440179 | |
July 06, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED DANIEL ROGER DOWNING | |
July 06, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED FOR USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY | |
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event | AMENDED ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR NON-COMPLEX CASES | |
March 29, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $401.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4369578 | |
March 29, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR NON-COMPLEX CASES | |
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event | COVER SHEET | |
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event | AUTO NEGLIGENCE CASE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.